MA H1873 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to pipefitter licensing and inspections. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to pipefitter licensing and inspections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-02-02 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1873 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13948&generalCourtId=1 |