MA H1868 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 98-4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-06 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/19/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-06 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/19/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prevent wage theft, promote employer accountability, and enhance public enforcement. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To prevent wage theft, promote employer accountability, and enhance public enforcement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/19/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-09-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1158 (Similar To) 2023-09-06 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/19/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1868 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1868.pdf |