MA H1867 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5038

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-16)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5038
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to nurse practitioner services and related care. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To support access, value and equity in health care (SAVE Act)

Sponsors

Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]
Rep. Denise Provost [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. Shawn Dooley [R]
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Steven Howitt [R]Rep. William Crocker [R]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]
Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]
Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]
Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]
Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]
Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Susan Gifford [R]Rep. David Muradian [R]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]
Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Sen. Viriato deMacedo [R]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. Thomas Golden [D]
Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. James Murphy [D]Rep. Norman Orrall [R]Rep. Rady Mom [D]
Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]
Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. James Kelcourse [R]
Sen. Michael Rush [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]
Rep. David Decoste [R]Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]
Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. David Nangle [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]
Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]
Rep. Colleen Garry [D]Sen. John Velis [D]Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. John Barrett [D]
Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Leonard Mirra [R]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-15HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5038
2020-04-23SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-02HouseReporting date extended to Saturday May 30, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-09-13JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H79 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Placed on file
H3388 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H914 (Similar To) 2019-11-08 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H1849 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1124 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S729 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S222 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
S1295 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2671
H1914 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S561 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S548 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S687 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S838 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S670 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S559 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S2447 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5038 (Replaced by) 2020-10-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback