MA H1856 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4844
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide remedies to consumers for clearing titles after the payoff of mortgages. The Judiciary.
Title
Providing remedies to consumers for clearing title after payoff of mortgages
Sponsors
Rep. John Rogers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4844 |
2021-07-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/03/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1915 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H1069 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S419 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4471
S642 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S3136 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1069 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S419 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4471
S642 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S3136 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1856 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1856.pdf |