MA H1856 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S933
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Accompanied S933
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Accompanied S933
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to a statewide public works municipal mutual aid agreement . Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to municipal public works mutual aid
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Kulik [D] | Rep. Denise Andrews [D] | Rep. Thomas Calter [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. William Pignatelli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-18 | Senate | Accompanied S933 |
2013-06-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S933 (Replaced by) 2014-07-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1856 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1856.pdf |