MA H1823 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-7)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-23 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Municipalities and Regional Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to remedy for the sale of sick puppies and kittens. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the remedy for the sale of sick puppies and kittens

Sponsors

Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Susan Gifford [R]
Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]
Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]
Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Rep. Joseph McKenna [R]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. Kay Khan [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]
Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]
Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Sen. John Velis [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Colleen Garry [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]
Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. David Biele [D]
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Linda Campbell [D]
Sen. Paul Feeney [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-23SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-02HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 8, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-27SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-26HouseReporting date extended to Monday March 23, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Monday March 2, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-05-28JointHearing scheduled for 06/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

S1423 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1419 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H845 (Similar To) 2019-08-28 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H1397 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H338 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H843 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback