MA H1806 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5127
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require that fiscal notes be attached to legislation providing unfunded mandates on municipal governments. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to protecting municipalities from unfunded mandates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5127 |
2019-09-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H1838 (Similar To) 2019-12-19 - Discharged to the Joint Committee on Financial Services
H1804 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
H2535 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied H2653
S520 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1200 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
S498 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S90 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H5127 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1804 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
H2535 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied H2653
S520 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1200 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
S498 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S90 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H5127 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1806 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1806.pdf |