MA H1794 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to handicapped parking spaces regulated by cities and towns. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
To ensure adequate handicapped parking
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D] | Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] |
Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-03-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-02-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-09-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H2668 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H1826 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H290 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2275 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2961 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2960 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H341 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S216 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H254 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1792 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4289
H1393 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1826 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H290 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2275 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2961 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2960 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H341 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S216 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H254 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1792 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4289
H1393 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1794 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1794.pdf |