MA H1777 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4651

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to establishing energy relief funds to provide relief for detrimental health effects and property losses caused by wind energy generation. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relieving the adverse effects of wind energy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4651
2017-09-12JointHearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

H4651 (Replaced by) 2018-06-25 - Reported, in part, by H1743

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback