MA H1774 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4844
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to furnishing alcoholic beverages to persons under twenty-one years of age. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the social host law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4844 |
2021-09-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2511 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2854
S2501 (Similar To) 2021-11-24 - New draft substituted, see S2587
S2506 (Similar To) 2022-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2507 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2855
S2504 (Similar To) 2022-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2159 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H453 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H458 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H373 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S1913 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S247 (Similar To) 2022-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2871
S2488 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
S248 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4589
S40 (Similar To) 2021-08-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2509
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2501 (Similar To) 2021-11-24 - New draft substituted, see S2587
S2506 (Similar To) 2022-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2507 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2855
S2504 (Similar To) 2022-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2159 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H453 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H458 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H373 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S1913 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S247 (Similar To) 2022-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2871
S2488 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
S248 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4589
S40 (Similar To) 2021-08-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2509
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1774 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1774.pdf |