MA H1750 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4844
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the availability of immunity to witnesses in the courts of the Commonwealth. The Judiciary.
Title
To enhance the availability of immunity to witnesses in the courts of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4844 |
2021-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1751 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1547 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1526 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4502
H1684 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1039 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1933
S946 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S3063
S999 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1547 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1526 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4502
H1684 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1039 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1933
S946 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S3063
S999 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1750 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1750.pdf |