MA H1732 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-11 - Accompanied by S1150
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to providing access to full spectrum addiction treatment services. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing access to full spectrum addiction treatment services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-11SenateAccompanied by S1150
2019-08-28JointHearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery

Same As/Similar To

S1150 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H3511 (Similar To) 2019-11-01 - Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S1138 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
S586 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback