MA H1724 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-14 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 15, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Mental Health, Substance Abuse and Recovery Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the mental health examination process of inmates at places of detention. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving the mental health examination process of inmates at places of detention

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-14HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday July 15, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-04-23SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-15HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 15, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-18SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday April 15, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-09-19JointHearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery

Same As/Similar To

H158 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4495
H1705 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H980 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
H908 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H3431 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S656 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1751 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H3304 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1135 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2276 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2532

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback