MA H1704 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4517

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to reform the hate crime statutes. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To reform the hate crime statutes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-05HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4517
2023-11-28JointHearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S996 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
S986 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
S1121 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H4517 (Replaced by) 2024-06-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback