MA H1698 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a penalty for the retrofitting of certain Diesel-powered vehicles with alternate emission devices. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the practice of coal rolling

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-04HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2024-04-04HouseRules suspended
2024-04-04HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2024-03-07HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2023-10-10JointHearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-04-24SenateSenate concurred
2023-04-20HouseDischarged to the Joint Committee on Transportation
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H4200 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback