MA H1688 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4844

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prohibit eminent domain takings for the purpose of economic development. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the defense of private property rights through the prevention of abusive eminent domain takings in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-09HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4844
2021-07-27JointHearing scheduled for 08/03/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H1692 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1857 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S273 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S151 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2709
S1959 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1826 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Hearing rescheduled to 01/25/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback