MA H1653 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4517

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to claims against certain corporations, its officers, or other persons for providing electronic records, information, facilities, or assistance in accordance with the terms of search warrants. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect private electronic communication, browsing and other activity

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-05HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4517
2023-11-15JointHearing scheduled for 11/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H4517 (Replaced by) 2024-06-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2736 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2738 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4791 (Similar To) 2024-06-26 - Published as amended, see H4801
S2804 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4801 (Similar To) 2024-06-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback