MA H1653 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4959
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-30 - Bills in the Third Reading discharged
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-30 - Bills in the Third Reading discharged
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit the prosecution of persons seeking medical assistance for the costs of drug-related overdoses
Title
Relating to Controlled Substances and Medical Treatment.
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Alice Peisch [D] | Rep. John Scibak [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-30 | Bills in the Third Reading discharged | |
2010-07-30 | New draft substituted, see H4959 | |
2010-07-30 | Read third | |
2010-07-30 | Rules suspended | |
2009-10-28 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2009-10-26 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2009-10-22 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4959 (Replaced by) 2010-08-02 - Read; and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H1653 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=5806&generalCourtId=2 |