MA H1648 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4706
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further protect first responders from unprotected exposures caused by needles and establishing a penalty for lying to emergency personnel about possession of such needles. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to possession of hypodermic needles and protecting public safety officials
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4706 |
2015-07-14 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-07-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1647 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1646 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3109 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1645 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2841 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H4706 (Replaced by) 2016-10-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1646 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3109 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1645 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2841 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H4706 (Replaced by) 2016-10-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1648 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1648.pdf |