MA H1646 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5123
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing willingness to work requirements for eligibility of unemployment benefits. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to willingness to work requirements for unemployment benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5123 |
2019-03-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1629 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H105 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4484
H5123 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H105 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4484
H5123 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1646 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1646.pdf |