MA H1605 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-30 - Hearing scheduled for 09/07/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-30 - Hearing scheduled for 09/07/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to obtaining relief from abuse and harassment. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to obtaining relief for a child or youth from abuse and harassment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/07/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2314 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
H4096 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S2542 (Similar To) 2024-01-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4096 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S2542 (Similar To) 2024-01-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1605 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1605.pdf |