MA H1568 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the safety of courthouses. The Judiciary.
Title
To increase the safety of courthouses
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H3882 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S2637 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S2637 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1568 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1568.pdf |