MA H1553 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5081

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to mental illness civil commitments. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to civil commitments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-12HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5081
2019-09-17JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H1750 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S938 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S605 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1571 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1043 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S2274 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback