MA H1550 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4602
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4602
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4602
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the transmitting of indecent visual depictions by persons younger than eighteen years of age. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to transmitting indecent visual depictions by teens
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. David Linsky [D] |
Rep. Stephan Hay [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4602 |
2019-11-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4602 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1550 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1550.pdf |