MA H155 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to persons with developmental disabilities. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to persons with developmental disabilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-02-10HouseRules suspended
2020-02-10HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2020-02-03HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-08-26JointHearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

H256 (Similar To) 2019-07-12 - Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H642 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H204 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H632 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H693 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H2800 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
H3350 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
H3440 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3222 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H2427 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H2833 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2066 (Similar To) 2019-08-22 - Hearing rescheduled to 08/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
H994 (Similar To) 2019-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S2312 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4044 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
H4050 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback