MA H1537 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the age of consent in certain criminal prosecutions and civil actions for sexual assault and rape of a child. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the age of consent in certain criminal prosecutions and civil actions for sexual assault and rape of a child

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-01HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-05-20SenateSenate concurred
2024-05-02HouseReporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-04-01SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-09-05JointHearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H1536 (Similar To) 2024-05-20 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback