MA H1517 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2805
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2805
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2805
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prevent the imposition of mandatory minimum sentences based on juvenile adjudication. The Judiciary.
Title
To prevent the imposition of mandatory minimum sentences based on juvenile adjudications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-09 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2805 |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-05-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-10-03 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1583 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1400 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S897 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S845 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2805
H3453 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2805 (Replaced by) 2020-07-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1400 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S897 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S845 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2805
H3453 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2805 (Replaced by) 2020-07-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1517 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1517.pdf |