MA H1517 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4706
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the designation of areas within municipalities where courts are located or court business is conducted as municipal judicial safety zones. The Judiciary.
Title
To curtail gang activity and witness intimidation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4706 |
2015-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4706 (Replaced by) 2016-10-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1512 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1513 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3051 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2640 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4213
H2161 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1512 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1513 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3051 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2640 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4213
H2161 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1517 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1517.pdf |