MA H1506 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to court orders for the sale of certain foreclosed property. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to foreclosed homes in neighborhoods
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1796 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
S644 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1473 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1373 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2492
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S644 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1473 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1373 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2492
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1506 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1506.pdf |