MA H1487 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to adults with disabilities in family and juvenile court proceedings. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting discrimination against adults with disabilities in family and juvenile court proceedings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-18SenateSenate concurred
2020-05-11HouseReporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-10SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-07-16JointHearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H2719 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1858 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2800 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
S901 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1806 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H172 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4349
S2401 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2416 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback