MA H1481 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4329

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4329
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the misrepresentation of a service animal. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the misrepresentation of a service animal

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-08HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4329
2023-03-28JointHearing scheduled for 04/04/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H4329 (Replaced by) 2024-04-11 - Committee reccomended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback