MA H1465 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the expungement of racially restrictive covenants in recorded real property documents. The Judiciary.
Title
Providing for the expungement of racially restrictive covenants in recorded real property documents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-07-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/03/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1465 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1465.pdf |