MA H1458 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4844
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a penalty for the sale of tattooing, branding or body piercing devices to unlicensed body art practitioners or minors. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to selling tattooing, branding, body piercing kit or device to an unlicensed body art practitioner or minor
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4844 |
2021-09-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S278 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
H1742 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1188 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1392 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
S937 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
S170 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S171 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H308 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied S171
H1742 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1188 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1392 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
S937 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
S170 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S171 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H308 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied S171
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1458 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1458.pdf |