MA H145 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5022
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to dedicating one-percent of the recreational marijuana excise to youth substance use prevention. Cannabis Policy.
Title
Dedicating one-percent of the recreational marijuana excise tax to youth substance use prevention
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5022 |
2021-11-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/01/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
Same As/Similar To
S78 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
H2286 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5197
S1014 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
H5022 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2286 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5197
S1014 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
H5022 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H145 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H145.pdf |