MA H1430 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5276
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit construction of certain structures within 500 feet of the border of wildlife management areas. Housing.
Title
Relative to wildlife management areas and 40B structures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5276 |
2021-11-01 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-11-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S905 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1394 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S895 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S896 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1394 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S895 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S896 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1430 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1430.pdf |