MA H143 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5088
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to eligibility for certain entitlement programs. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to the utilization of the systematic alien verification for entitlements program by the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5088 |
2019-10-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S45 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2532
H5088 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H5088 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H143 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H143.pdf |