MA H1424 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5276
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the condominium laws. Housing.
Title
Relative to a special commission to study condominium law
Sponsors
Rep. Hannah Kane [R] | Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. David Linsky [D] |
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Adam Scanlon [D] | Rep. Steven Owens [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5276 |
2021-10-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/02/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-10-25 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2021-10-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/02/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S175 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2677
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1424 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1424.pdf |