MA H1417 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to construction and development of state-aided or federally assisted public housing projects. Housing.
Title
Restoring the Commonwealth's public housing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-09-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S859 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S878 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S883 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1419 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H3656 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1445 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S906 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S878 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S883 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1419 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H3656 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1445 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S906 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1417 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1417.pdf |