MA H1416 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to electronic meetings and voting in condominiums. Housing.
Title
Relative to electronic meetings and voting in condominiums
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Honan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-08 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2022-12-05 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-10-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/02/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-10-25 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2021-10-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/02/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H1412 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1423 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3008 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1387 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5271
S877 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1423 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3008 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1387 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5271
S877 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1416 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1416.pdf |