MA H1380 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5276
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to relief in a tenant counterclaim. Housing.
Title
Relative to capital relief in a counterclaim
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5276 |
2022-01-04 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S1800 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S559 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - New draft substituted, see S3095
S894 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S3069
S890 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S559 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - New draft substituted, see S3095
S894 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S3069
S890 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1380 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1380.pdf |