MA H1378 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Tyler of Boston, a petition of Chynah Tyler that senior housing facilities provide security services to ensure the safety and security of residents. Housing.
Title
To ensure senior home safety and security
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | House | No further action taken |
2024-08-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-07-15 | House | House concurred |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-04 | House | No further action take on the extension to Thursday, April 18, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday April 18, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S2368 (Similar To) 2023-12-04 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2517
S2460 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
S2517 (Similar To) 2024-01-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2024
H4841 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
S2460 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
S2517 (Similar To) 2024-01-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2024
H4841 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1378 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1378.pdf |