MA H1377 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to classify certain probation officers and court officers in Group 4 of the contributory retirement system for public employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to further defining employees classified in Group 4
Sponsors
Rep. James Dwyer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-02-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-10-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H1376 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1320 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1453 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3677 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2571 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1320 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1453 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3677 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2571 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1377 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1377.pdf |