MA H1366 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the town of Chatham be authorized to establish a housing trust fund in said town. Housing. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a housing trust fund in the town of Chatham

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-18SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2023-12-14SenateRead; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2023-12-11HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2023-11-20HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2023-11-20HouseRules suspended
2023-11-20HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2023-10-18HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2023-06-05JointHearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

H1377 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1341 (Similar To) 2024-02-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2024
H1914 (Similar To) 2024-05-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4570

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback