MA H1352 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the penalty for assault and battery on public employees. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to assault and battery on public employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-04-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2197 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S838 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2680 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H638 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H1374 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1595 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2197 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S838 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2680 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H638 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H1374 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1595 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1352 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1352.pdf |