MA H1346 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the liability cap for malpractice resulting in serious injury or death. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removing the liability cap for malpractice resulting in serious injury or death

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-11-05JointHearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H1412 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S567 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H1085 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S956 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - House concurred
S1032 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1382 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3834 (Similar To) 2019-09-10 - Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback