MA H1343 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5174
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to financial literacy counseling for students accepted at public institutions of higher education. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to higher education financial literacy counseling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5174 |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S844 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H2786 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S850 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4018 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2021
H4056 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4018
S849 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1929 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S1170 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S821 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2746
S824 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S825 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S826 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H5174 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H2786 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S850 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4018 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2021
H4056 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4018
S849 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1929 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S1170 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S821 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2746
S824 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S825 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S826 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H5174 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1343 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1343.pdf |