MA H1340 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to recognize common law marriage in the Commonwealth. The Judiciary.
Title
To recognize common law marriage in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Balser [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-09-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1478 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3308 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S944 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S24 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2294
H3565 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3308 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S944 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S24 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2294
H3565 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1340 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1340.pdf |