MA H1339 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4694
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4694
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4694
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to free public higher education. Higher Education.
Title
To guarantee debt-free public higher education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4694 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H2786 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1333 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4694
S824 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
H3693 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S841 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2744
S842 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
H4694 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S829 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
H1333 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4694
S824 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
H3693 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S841 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2744
S842 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
H4694 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S829 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1339 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1339.pdf |