MA H1327 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court


Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]


That the town of Mansfield be authorized to institute appropriate recruitment procedures for police cadets in said town, notwithstanding certain provisions of the civil service law. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Authorizing the appointing authority of the town of Mansfield to appoint police cadets under certain circumstances to the police department of said town



2018-02-01SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-01-18SenateRead and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2018-01-16HouseRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2017-10-31HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2017-10-31HouseRules suspended
2017-10-31HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2017-10-26HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2017-03-21JointHearing scheduled for 03/28/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H1098 (Similar To) 2018-01-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources

Bill Comments