MA H1322 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4706

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the use of information derived from unmanned aerial vehicles as evidence in judicial, regulatory or other government proceedings. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To regulate the use of unmanned aerial vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-10-24HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4706
2015-09-29JointHearing scheduled for 10/06/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H4706 (Replaced by) 2016-10-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H385 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H382 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H146 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4120
H191 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H1321 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback